Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Capital Budgets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 /CH0021 (SB0782/CH0087)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151 /CH0022 (SB0171)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0782 (SB0699)
Title
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 (HB0151/CH0022)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 (HB0467/CH0782)
Title
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 /CH0087 (HB0074/CH0021)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1198 /CH0019
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017
Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 /CH0021 (SB0782/CH0087) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium Delegate Grammer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0151 /CH0022 (SB0171) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0467 /CH0782 (SB0699) Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act Delegate McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0171 (HB0151/CH0022) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0699 (HB0467/CH0782) Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0782 /CH0087 (HB0074/CH0021) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium Senator Salling 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1198 /CH0019 Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017 Prince George's County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page