Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Caroline County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 /CH0998 (SB0531/CH0999)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 /CH1000 (SB0529/CH1001)
Title
Caroline County – Alcoholic Beverages – Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0386)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0456)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529 /CH1001 (HB0363/CH1000)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 /CH0999 (HB0362/CH0998)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0722
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0362 /CH0998 (SB0531/CH0999) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 998
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0363 /CH1000 (SB0529/CH1001) Caroline County – Alcoholic Beverages – Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1000
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0456 (SB0386) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0386 (HB0456) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0529 /CH1001 (HB0363/CH1000) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License Caroline County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1001
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0531 /CH0999 (HB0362/CH0998) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Caroline County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 999
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0966 /CH0722 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 5:12 PM
Click to return on the top page