Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Carroll County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0386)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0310 (SB1108/CH0311)
Title
Carroll County – Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff – Oath of Office
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 /CH0684 (SB0693)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 /CH0685 (SB0437/CH0686)
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchasing
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0988 (SB0965)
Title
Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 (SB0963)
Title
Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Permit or License for Unpaid Personal Property Taxes
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0456)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 /CH0686 (HB0839/CH0685)
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchasing
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 (HB0796/CH0684)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB1080)
Title
Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Commercial Permit or License for Unpaid Assessed Personal Property Taxes
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 /CH1045
Title
Carroll County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Alcohol Awareness Training
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 (HB1060/CH0988)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1108 /CH0311 (HB0720/CH0310)
Title
Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0243 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Revisions Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0456 (SB0386) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0720 /CH0310 (SB1108/CH0311) Carroll County – Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff – Oath of Office Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0796 /CH0684 (SB0693) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0839 /CH0685 (SB0437/CH0686) Carroll County - Contracts and Purchasing Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1060 /CH0988 (SB0965) Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 988
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1080 (SB0963) Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Permit or License for Unpaid Personal Property Taxes Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0386 (HB0456) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0437 /CH0686 (HB0839/CH0685) Carroll County - Contracts and Purchasing Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0693 (HB0796/CH0684) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0963 (HB1080) Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Commercial Permit or License for Unpaid Assessed Personal Property Taxes Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0964 /CH1045 Carroll County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Alcohol Awareness Training Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1045
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0965 (HB1060/CH0988) Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1108 /CH0311 (HB0720/CH0310) Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page