Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Cecil County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391
Title
County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856
Title
Horse Racing - Distribution of Racetrack Facility Renewal Account Funds - Alterations
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0335)
Title
Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0477)
Title
Port of Deposit State Historical Park - Size and Scope
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 (HB1184)
Title
Port of Deposit State Historical Park - Size and Scope
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0922)
Title
Sports Wagering - Independent Evaluation of Sports Wagering Content - Required
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0391 County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0856 Horse Racing - Distribution of Racetrack Facility Renewal Account Funds - Alterations Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0892 (SB0335) Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1184 (SB0477) Port of Deposit State Historical Park - Size and Scope Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1519 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2025 - 2:40 PM
SB0477 (HB1184) Port of Deposit State Historical Park - Size and Scope Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0922) Sports Wagering - Independent Evaluation of Sports Wagering Content - Required Senator Zucker 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page