Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Census -see also- Data; Demographics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 /CH0732
Title
Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033
Title
Environment and Energy - Investment in Overburdened Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 /CH0588 (SB0818)
Title
Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473 /CH0454
Title
Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 /CH0455
Title
Prince George’s County – School Board Districts – Redistricting Plan
Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 (HB1200/CH0588)
Title
Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 /CH0394 (HB0855/CH0393)
Title
Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0478 /CH0732 Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1033 Environment and Energy - Investment in Overburdened Communities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1200 /CH0588 (SB0818) Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening Delegate Wells 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1473 /CH0454 Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2022 - 8:30 AM
Reapportionment and Redistricting
SB0444 /CH0455 Prince George’s County – School Board Districts – Redistricting Plan Prince George's County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Reapportionment and Redistricting
2/17/2022 - 11:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/06/2022 - 11:00 AM
SB0818 (HB1200/CH0588) Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0942 /CH0394 (HB0855/CH0393) Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:28 PM
Click to return on the top page