Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Census

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 (SB0571)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Class A (Off-Sale) and Class D (Off-Sale) Licenses - Population Ratio Quota
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203
Title
Districting - Single-Member Districts and Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Convention
Sponsor
Delegate Bouchat
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484 (SB0978)
Title
Environmental Permits - Requirements for Public Participation and Impact and Burden Analyses (Cumulative Harms to Environmental Restoration For Improving Shared Health - CHERISH Our Communities Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1529 (SB0656)
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Alterations of Elected Member Districts and Establishment of Redistricting Process
Sponsor
Delegate McCaskill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 (HB0274)
Title
Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0099)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Class A (Off-Sale) and Class D (Off-Sale) Licenses - Population Ratio Quota
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB1529)
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Alterations of Elected Member Districts and Establishment of Redistricting Process
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 (HB0983)
Title
Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Language Assistance Program
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 (HB1484)
Title
Environmental Permits - Requirements for Public Participation and Impact and Burden Analyses (Cumulative Harms to Environmental Restoration for Improving Shared Health - CHERISH Our Communities Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 (SB0571) Anne Arundel County - Class A (Off-Sale) and Class D (Off-Sale) Licenses - Population Ratio Quota Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/17/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0203 Districting - Single-Member Districts and Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Convention Delegate Bouchat 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2025 - 3:00 PM
HB1484 (SB0978) Environmental Permits - Requirements for Public Participation and Impact and Burden Analyses (Cumulative Harms to Environmental Restoration For Improving Shared Health - CHERISH Our Communities Act) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1529 (SB0656) Baltimore County Board of Education - Alterations of Elected Member Districts and Establishment of Redistricting Process Delegate McCaskill 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0259 (HB0274) Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 (HB0099) Anne Arundel County - Class A (Off-Sale) and Class D (Off-Sale) Licenses - Population Ratio Quota Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0656 (HB1529) Baltimore County Board of Education - Alterations of Elected Member Districts and Establishment of Redistricting Process Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/19/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0685 (HB0983) Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Language Assistance Program Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0978 (HB1484) Environmental Permits - Requirements for Public Participation and Impact and Burden Analyses (Cumulative Harms to Environmental Restoration for Improving Shared Health - CHERISH Our Communities Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 11:27 PM
Click to return on the top page