Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Charles County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 (SB0148)
Title
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 /CH0738 (SB0081/CH0739)
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0470)
Title
Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 /CH0543 (SB0833/CH0544)
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 (SB0939)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072 /CH0374 (SB0750/CH0375)
Title
Charles County – Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs – Authorization
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081 /CH0739 (HB0414/CH0738)
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0066)
Title
Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB0439)
Title
Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663
Title
Charles County - Cemeteries - Sediment Control, Stormwater Management, and Forest Conservation
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 /CH0375 (HB1072/CH0374)
Title
Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 /CH0544 (HB1018/CH0543)
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1024)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 (SB0148) Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021) Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0414 /CH0738 (SB0081/CH0739) Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Appropriations
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
HB0439 (SB0470) Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0655 Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 /CH0543 (SB0833/CH0544) Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1024 (SB0939) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Delegate Patterson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 404
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1072 /CH0374 (SB0750/CH0375) Charles County – Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs – Authorization Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 374
Judiciary
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0081 /CH0739 (HB0414/CH0738) Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
SB0148 (HB0066) Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0163 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Pilot Program Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0470 (HB0439) Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0663 Charles County - Cemeteries - Sediment Control, Stormwater Management, and Forest Conservation Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0750 /CH0375 (HB1072/CH0374) Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 375
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0833 /CH0544 (HB1018/CH0543) Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0939 (HB1024) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page