Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Charles County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151
Title
Charles County Board of Education - Vacancy Procedures - Timing and Video Streaming and Archiving
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 (SB0576)
Title
Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0429)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Cobb Island
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0386)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687
Title
Charles County – Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities – Member Training
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690
Title
Charles County - Adult Protective Services Review Board - Membership
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 (SB1126)
Title
Transportation – Regional Transportation Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate Spiegel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Land Use - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Subdivision Regulations - Property Dedication and Fee
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012
Title
College of Southern Maryland - Board of Trustees Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081
Title
Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Budget
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121
Title
College of Southern Maryland - Funding and Responsibilities - La Plata Pool
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Charles County Public Library - Imagination Library Program - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0456)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0391)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0248)
Title
Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1126 (HB0924)
Title
Transportation – Regional Transportation Authorities
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0151 Charles County Board of Education - Vacancy Procedures - Timing and Video Streaming and Archiving Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
1/25/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0248 (SB0576) Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0391 (SB0429) Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington Delegate Morgan, T. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0440 Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Cobb Island Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 (SB0386) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0687 Charles County – Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities – Member Training Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0690 Charles County - Adult Protective Services Review Board - Membership Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0924 (SB1126) Transportation – Regional Transportation Authorities Delegate Spiegel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1321 Land Use - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Subdivision Regulations - Property Dedication and Fee Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0012 College of Southern Maryland - Board of Trustees Membership - Alterations Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/24/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0081 Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Budget Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/24/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0121 College of Southern Maryland - Funding and Responsibilities - La Plata Pool Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0163 Charles County Public Library - Imagination Library Program - Funding Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0456) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0429 (HB0391) Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0248) Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0966 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1126 (HB0924) Transportation – Regional Transportation Authorities Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page