Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Charles County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651 (SB0816)
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835 (SB0731)
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Baseball Stadium License - Alterations
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 /CH0081 (SB0730/CH0082)
Title
Gaming - Charles County Gaming Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0335)
Title
Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283 (SB0912)
Title
Charles County - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Regulation and Enforcement
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284 (SB0728)
Title
Charles County - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1359
Title
Charles County - Student Bus Transportation Providers - Provider Displacement
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370 (SB0881)
Title
Transportation - Regional Transportation Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate Spiegel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725
Title
Charles County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License and Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727
Title
Charles County – Student Bus Transportation Providers – Provider Displacement
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB1284)
Title
Charles County - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 /CH0082 (HB0841/CH0081)
Title
Gaming - Charles County Gaming Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 (HB0835)
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Baseball Stadium License - Alterations
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB0651)
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1370)
Title
Transportation - Regional Transportation Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB1283)
Title
Charles County – Off–Highway Recreational Vehicles – Regulation and Enforcement
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935
Title
Transportation - Regional Authorities - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0651 (SB0816) Public Service Commission - Membership - Alterations Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0835 (SB0731) Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Baseball Stadium License - Alterations Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0841 /CH0081 (SB0730/CH0082) Gaming - Charles County Gaming Permit Review Board - Repeal Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Ways and Means
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0892 (SB0335) Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1283 (SB0912) Charles County - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Regulation and Enforcement Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1284 (SB0728) Charles County - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1359 Charles County - Student Bus Transportation Providers - Provider Displacement Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 (SB0881) Transportation - Regional Transportation Authorities Delegate Spiegel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1519 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2025 - 2:40 PM
SB0725 Charles County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License and Video Lottery Terminals Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0727 Charles County – Student Bus Transportation Providers – Provider Displacement Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2025 - 9:00 AM
SB0728 (HB1284) Charles County - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 /CH0082 (HB0841/CH0081) Gaming - Charles County Gaming Permit Review Board - Repeal Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0731 (HB0835) Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Baseball Stadium License - Alterations Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0816 (HB0651) Public Service Commission - Membership - Alterations Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1370) Transportation - Regional Transportation Authorities Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0912 (HB1283) Charles County – Off–Highway Recreational Vehicles – Regulation and Enforcement Charles County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0935 Transportation - Regional Authorities - Established Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page