Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Chartered Counties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061 (SB0081)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705
Title
Land Use - Reporting - Annual Reports and Development of New Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 (SB0871)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 (SB1002)
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081 (HB0061)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1259)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB1481)
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 (SB0081) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0705 Land Use - Reporting - Annual Reports and Development of New Housing Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 (SB0871) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 (SB1002) Charter and Code Home Rule Counties - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0081 (HB0061) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0871 (HB1259) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1002 (HB1481) Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/21/2022 10:58 AM
Click to return on the top page