Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Chartered Counties -see also- AACo; BCity; BCo; HarfCo; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0090 (SB0274/CH0089)
Title
Charter Counties - Comprehensive Plans - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Bouchat
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 /CH0811 (SB0522/CH0810)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0660)
Title
Maryland Voting Rights Act of 2024 – Counties and Municipalities
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449 (SB1045)
Title
Zoning – Board of Appeals Decisions or Zoning Actions – Judicial Review
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 /CH0089 (HB0017/CH0090)
Title
Charter Counties - Comprehensive Plans - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0810 (HB0501/CH0811)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Laws
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0660 (HB0800)
Title
Maryland Voting Rights Act of 2024 - Counties and Municipalities
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1045 (HB1449)
Title
Zoning – Board of Appeals Decisions or Zoning Actions – Judicial Review
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0090 (SB0274/CH0089) Charter Counties - Comprehensive Plans - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0081 Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule Delegate Bouchat 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0501 /CH0811 (SB0522/CH0810) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Laws Delegate Fennell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 811
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0800 (SB0660) Maryland Voting Rights Act of 2024 – Counties and Municipalities Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1449 (SB1045) Zoning – Board of Appeals Decisions or Zoning Actions – Judicial Review Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 /CH0089 (HB0017/CH0090) Charter Counties - Comprehensive Plans - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/25/2024 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0522 /CH0810 (HB0501/CH0811) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Laws Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 810
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0660 (HB0800) Maryland Voting Rights Act of 2024 - Counties and Municipalities Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1045 (HB1449) Zoning – Board of Appeals Decisions or Zoning Actions – Judicial Review Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page