Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Charters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0368)
Title
Municipalities – Charter Amendments – Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 /CH0317 (SB0125/CH0316)
Title
Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 /CH0289 (SB0879/CH0290)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0292 (SB0431/CH0293)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 /CH0316 (HB0853/CH0317)
Title
Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368 (HB0381)
Title
Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 /CH0293 (HB0999/CH0292)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879 /CH0290 (HB0996/CH0289)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0381 (SB0368) Municipalities – Charter Amendments – Notice Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0770 Enoch Pratt Free Library - Collective Bargaining Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0853 /CH0317 (SB0125/CH0316) Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations Delegate Saab 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Economic Matters
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0996 /CH0289 (SB0879/CH0290) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Economic Matters
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0999 /CH0292 (SB0431/CH0293) Corporations and Associations – Revisions Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Economic Matters
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0125 /CH0316 (HB0853/CH0317) Revival of Nonstock and Religious Corporations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0368 (HB0381) Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0431 /CH0293 (HB0999/CH0292) Corporations and Associations - Revisions Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0879 /CH0290 (HB0996/CH0289) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 4:17 PM
Click to return on the top page