Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Checks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 /CH0003 (SB1008/CH0004)
Title
Economic Development - Small Business Guaranty Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0665)
Title
Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665 (HB0761)
Title
Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1008 /CH0004 (HB0601/CH0003)
Title
Economic Development - Small Business Guaranty Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0601 /CH0003 (SB1008/CH0004) Economic Development - Small Business Guaranty Fund - Alterations Delegate Phillips 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Ways and Means
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0761 (SB0665) Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0665 (HB0761) Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Revisions President 6 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB1008 /CH0004 (HB0601/CH0003) Economic Development - Small Business Guaranty Fund - Alterations Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Finance
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page