Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Child Abuse and Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042 /CH0765 (SB0220/CH0766)
Title
Public Health - Public Health Services and Protections - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141
Title
Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0365)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508 /CH0349 (SB0550/CH0348)
Title
Children - Labor Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644
Title
Family Law - Caretaker Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100 (SB1110)
Title
Health - Child Advocacy Centers - Reporting Requirements and Investigations
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 (SB0883)
Title
Education – Virtual Tutoring Services – Applicant Review
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254
Title
Child Care Providers - Criminal History Records Checks and Abuse and Neglect Clearances - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153
Title
Maryland Department of Transportation - Child Exploitation and Human Trafficking Awareness, Training, and Response
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195
Title
Juveniles - Arrest by Law Enforcement - Report to Local Department of Social Services
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 /CH0766 (HB0042/CH0765)
Title
Public Health – Public Health Services and Protections – Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0313
Title
Maryland Wiretap and Electronic Surveillance Reform Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0405)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 /CH0348 (HB0508/CH0349)
Title
Children - Labor Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Best Interest of the Child
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1140)
Title
Education - Virtual Tutoring Services - Background Checks and Fingerprinting
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1110 (HB1100)
Title
Health – Child Advocacy Centers – Reporting Requirements and Investigations
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 /CH0765 (SB0220/CH0766) Public Health - Public Health Services and Protections - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0141 Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808) Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 809
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0405 (SB0365) Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0508 /CH0349 (SB0550/CH0348) Children - Labor Trafficking Delegate Embry 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0644 Family Law - Caretaker Bill of Rights Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0937 Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1100 (SB1110) Health - Child Advocacy Centers - Reporting Requirements and Investigations Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1140 (SB0883) Education – Virtual Tutoring Services – Applicant Review Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1254 Child Care Providers - Criminal History Records Checks and Abuse and Neglect Clearances - Requirements Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0089 Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure Senator James 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 Maryland Department of Transportation - Child Exploitation and Human Trafficking Awareness, Training, and Response Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 808
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0195 Juveniles - Arrest by Law Enforcement - Report to Local Department of Social Services Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 /CH0766 (HB0042/CH0765) Public Health – Public Health Services and Protections – Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 766
Finance
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0313 Maryland Wiretap and Electronic Surveillance Reform Workgroup Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0365 (HB0405) Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 /CH0348 (HB0508/CH0349) Children - Labor Trafficking Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0670 Child Custody and Visitation - Best Interest of the Child Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB1140) Education - Virtual Tutoring Services - Background Checks and Fingerprinting Senator King 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1110 (HB1100) Health – Child Advocacy Centers – Reporting Requirements and Investigations Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page