Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Child Custody -see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 (SB0041)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0776)
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561 (SB0017/CH0351)
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation – Disease or Illness
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947
Title
Family Law - Joint Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995 (SB0920)
Title
Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036
Title
Child Custody - Relocation of Child - Expedited Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 (SB0849)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision-Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 (SB0336)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 /CH0351 (HB0561)
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 (HB0104)
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203 /CH0228
Title
Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB1407)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB0454)
Title
Correctional Services – Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB1168)
Title
Child Custody – Legal Decision–Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Actions - Considered Judgment of Minor Children
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920 (HB0995)
Title
Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations and Study
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0104 (SB0041) Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0454 (SB0776) Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act) Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0561 (SB0017/CH0351) Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0564 Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation – Disease or Illness Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 Family Law - Joint Custody Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0995 (SB0920) Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations and Study Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1036 Child Custody - Relocation of Child - Expedited Hearing Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1141 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 (SB0849) Child Custody - Legal Decision-Making and Parenting Time Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1407 (SB0336) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0017 /CH0351 (HB0561) Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 (HB0104) Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0203 /CH0228 Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 (HB1407) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0776 (HB0454) Correctional Services – Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0849 (HB1168) Child Custody – Legal Decision–Making and Parenting Time Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0889 Family Law - Child Custody Actions - Considered Judgment of Minor Children Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 (HB0995) Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations and Study Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2022 5:02 PM
Click to return on the top page