Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Civic Organizations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0188)
Title
Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 (SB0576)
Title
Labor and Employment - Mandatory Meetings on Religious or Political Matters - Employee Attendance and Participation (Maryland Worker Freedom Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 (SB1029)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354 (SB1021)
Title
Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Requirements for Sale or Transfer or Government Acquisition
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406
Title
Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Environmental Impact Analysis and Existing Burden Report
Sponsor
Delegate Behler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057
Title
Funeral Establishments, Crematories, and Reduction Facilities - Disposition of Unclaimed Remains - Veterans
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0172)
Title
Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0494
Title
Procurement Contracts and Public-Private Partnerships - Project Labor Agreements, Community Benefit Agreements, and Use of Registered Apprentices
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0233)
Title
Labor and Employment - Mandatory Meetings on Religious or Political Matters - Employee Attendance and Participation (Maryland Worker Freedom Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021 (HB1354)
Title
Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Requirements for Sale or Transfer or Government Acquisition
Sponsor
Senator Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 (SB0188) Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Alterations Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 (SB0576) Labor and Employment - Mandatory Meetings on Religious or Political Matters - Employee Attendance and Participation (Maryland Worker Freedom Act) Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0868 (SB1029) Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 (SB1021) Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Requirements for Sale or Transfer or Government Acquisition Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1406 Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Environmental Impact Analysis and Existing Burden Report Delegate Behler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 Funeral Establishments, Crematories, and Reduction Facilities - Disposition of Unclaimed Remains - Veterans Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 (HB0172) Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Alterations Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2025 - 10:30 AM
SB0494 Procurement Contracts and Public-Private Partnerships - Project Labor Agreements, Community Benefit Agreements, and Use of Registered Apprentices Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0576 (HB0233) Labor and Employment - Mandatory Meetings on Religious or Political Matters - Employee Attendance and Participation (Maryland Worker Freedom Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Beidle)
Finance
SB1021 (HB1354) Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Requirements for Sale or Transfer or Government Acquisition Senator Jackson, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/31/2025 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page