Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Civil Offenses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0119 (SB0229/CH0120)
Title
Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 (SB0168)
Title
Task Force to Study Aggressive and Reckless Driving
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 /CH0104
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Civil Penalties - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 (SB0619)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis-Related Offenses - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0677)
Title
Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 (SB0436)
Title
Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Civil Penalty and Referrals
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance – Pet Insurance – Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0650)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Notice and Removal of Item or Symbol (Hate Crimes Graffiti Removal Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135
Title
Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George’s County – Enforcement of Local Vacant Property Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Environment - Playground Surfacing Materials - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0998)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 (HB0267)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Retail Supply - Regulation and Consumer Protection
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 (HB0187)
Title
Task Force to Study Aggressive and Reckless Driving
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 /CH0120 (HB0067/CH0119)
Title
Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379
Title
Task Force to Study Crime Classification - Renaming, Membership, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 (HB0441)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis-Related Offenses - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB0699)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Notice and Removal of Item or Symbol
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 (HB0455)
Title
Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB1425)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1159
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Events - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0119 (SB0229/CH0120) Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0187 (SB0168) Task Force to Study Aggressive and Reckless Driving Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
HB0244 /CH0104 Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Civil Penalties - Alterations Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Economic Matters
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 (SB0619) Criminal Law - Cannabis-Related Offenses - Civil Penalties Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 (SB0677) Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements Speaker 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0465 (SB0436) Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Civil Penalty and Referrals Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0647 Property and Casualty Insurance – Pet Insurance – Regulation Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0699 (SB0650) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Notice and Removal of Item or Symbol (Hate Crimes Graffiti Removal Act) Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1135 Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024 Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1142 Montgomery County and Prince George’s County – Enforcement of Local Vacant Property Laws Delegate Martinez 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1147 Environment - Playground Surfacing Materials - Prohibitions Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 (SB0998) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0001 (HB0267) Electricity and Gas - Retail Supply - Regulation and Consumer Protection Senator Augustine 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/25/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0168 (HB0187) Task Force to Study Aggressive and Reckless Driving Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0229 /CH0120 (HB0067/CH0119) Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0379 Task Force to Study Crime Classification - Renaming, Membership, and Duties Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0619 (HB0441) Criminal Law - Cannabis-Related Offenses - Civil Penalties Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
SB0650 (HB0699) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Notice and Removal of Item or Symbol Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 (HB0455) Comptroller - Electronic Tax and Fee Return Filing Requirements President 6 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0998 (HB1425) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1159 Criminal Law - Unruly Social Events - Prohibition Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page