Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Clean Energy Credits -see also- Envir.Incent; Renew.Energy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049 (SB0256)
Title
Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards - Alterations and Analysis
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 (SB0434)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Renaming and Alterations
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB0505)
Title
Empowering New Energy Resources and Green Initiatives Toward a Zero-Emission (ENERGIZE) Maryland Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716
Title
Public Utilities - Nuclear Energy - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Procurement (Decarbonization Infrastructure Solutions Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 (SB0256) Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards - Alterations and Analysis Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0505 (SB0434) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Renaming and Alterations Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
2/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0434 (HB0505) Empowering New Energy Resources and Green Initiatives Toward a Zero-Emission (ENERGIZE) Maryland Act President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 Public Utilities - Nuclear Energy - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Procurement (Decarbonization Infrastructure Solutions Act of 2025) Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2025 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page