Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Clerks of Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190
Title
District Court Electronic Citation Fund and Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0641
Title
Vehicle Laws - Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0950 /CH0054 (SB0421/CH0053)
Title
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 (SB0819)
Title
Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 /CH0053 (HB0950/CH0054)
Title
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 (HB1156)
Title
Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0190 District Court Electronic Citation Fund and Fee Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 /CH0641 Vehicle Laws - Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Administrative Penalties Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0950 /CH0054 (SB0421/CH0053) Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1156 (SB0819) Maryland Contributory Negligence Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 /CH0053 (HB0950/CH0054) Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 (HB1156) Maryland Contributory Negligence Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page