Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Clinics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0702)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 (SB0980)
Title
Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783 (SB0717)
Title
Task Force to Study School-Based Health Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0395)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717 (HB0783)
Title
Task Force to Study School-Based Health Centers
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980 (HB0441)
Title
Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0395 (SB0702) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 (SB0980) Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Health and Government Operations
HB0783 (SB0717) Task Force to Study School-Based Health Centers Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1373 Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB0395) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 (HB0783) Task Force to Study School-Based Health Centers Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0980 (HB0441) Anesthesia Services - Assignment of Billing Rights and Fees for Management Services - Prohibition Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page