Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Coastal Bays

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0709)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Lot Coverage - Exclusion for Driveways Constructed of Decking Material
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Lot Coverage - Calculation for Swimming Pools
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Nitrogen Removal Technology - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145 (SB0903)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB0419)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 /CH0124
Title
Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB1145)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0419 (SB0709) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0962 Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Lot Coverage - Exclusion for Driveways Constructed of Decking Material Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0963 Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Lot Coverage - Calculation for Swimming Pools Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Nitrogen Removal Technology - Exemption Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1145 (SB0903) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0709 (HB0419) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0863 /CH0124 Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Revisions Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0903 (HB1145) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page