Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Codes -see also- Annotated Code of Md; Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0075 (SB0262)
Title
Election Law – Special Elections
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 (SB0175)
Title
Public Safety - Fuel Gas Piping Systems and Corrugated Stainless Steel Tubing - Prohibitions and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Report on Oversight of Substance Use Disorder Treatment Programs and Recovery Residences
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 (HB0222)
Title
Public Safety - Fuel Gas Piping Systems and Corrugated Stainless Steel Tubing - Prohibitions and Study
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0075)
Title
Election Law - Special Elections
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0075 (SB0262) Election Law – Special Elections Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0222 (SB0175) Public Safety - Fuel Gas Piping Systems and Corrugated Stainless Steel Tubing - Prohibitions and Study Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0335 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0722 Maryland Department of Health - Report on Oversight of Substance Use Disorder Treatment Programs and Recovery Residences Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 (HB0222) Public Safety - Fuel Gas Piping Systems and Corrugated Stainless Steel Tubing - Prohibitions and Study Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 (HB0075) Election Law - Special Elections Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2025 8:59 AM
Click to return on the top page