Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commercial Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0449 (SB0289/CH0450)
Title
Historic Revitalization and Enterprise Zone Tax Credits - Alterations and Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250
Title
Private Well Safety Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268 /CH0327 (SB0274/CH0328)
Title
Property Tax - Exemptions for Business Personal Property - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 (SB0393)
Title
Economic Development - Project Restore Program and Fund
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831
Title
Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340 /CH0283
Title
Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451 /CH0380
Title
Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0246
Title
Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 (HB0069)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 /CH0328 (HB0268/CH0327)
Title
Property Tax - Exemptions for Business Personal Property - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0414)
Title
Economic Development - Project Restore Program and Fund
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491
Title
Property Tax - Taxation of Business Property - Tax Rates, Exemptions, and Credits
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
State Building Code - Electric Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0449 (SB0289/CH0450) Historic Revitalization and Enterprise Zone Tax Credits - Alterations and Eligibility Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Ways and Means
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0250 Private Well Safety Act of 2022 Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Hester) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0268 /CH0327 (SB0274/CH0328) Property Tax - Exemptions for Business Personal Property - Alterations Delegate Henson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0414 (SB0393) Economic Development - Project Restore Program and Fund Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0831 Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1340 /CH0283 Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
HB1451 /CH0380 Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0246 Energy Storage Systems - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0247 (HB0069) State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Real Property Assessments and Appeals Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2022 - 2:45 PM
SB0274 /CH0328 (HB0268/CH0327) Property Tax - Exemptions for Business Personal Property - Alterations Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0393 (HB0414) Economic Development - Project Restore Program and Fund President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0491 Property Tax - Taxation of Business Property - Tax Rates, Exemptions, and Credits Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 State Building Code - Electric Vehicles Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page