Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Community Development

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Revitalization Districts
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659 /CH0615 (SB0823/CH0616)
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program Tax Credit - Maximum Contributions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345 /CH0523
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1514 (SB0812)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796
Title
Economic Development - County Economic Development Tax Incentives Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB1514)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 /CH0616 (HB0659/CH0615)
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0107 Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0114 Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Revitalization Districts Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0659 /CH0615 (SB0823/CH0616) Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0690 Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program Tax Credit - Maximum Contributions Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1345 /CH0523 National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1514 (SB0812) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0796 Economic Development - County Economic Development Tax Incentives Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 (HB1514) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0823 /CH0616 (HB0659/CH0615) Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page