Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commuters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0516)
Title
Equitable and Inclusive Transit–Oriented Development Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 (SB0471)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 /CH0118
Title
Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0729)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 (HB0710)
Title
Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0710 (SB0516) Equitable and Inclusive Transit–Oriented Development Enhancement Act Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0729 (SB0471) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0210 /CH0118 Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB0729) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 (HB0710) Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act Senator Augustine 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 10:52 AM
Click to return on the top page