Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Condemnation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 (SB0376)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427 (SB0557/CH0717)
Title
Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 (HB1083)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 /CH0717 (HB1427)
Title
Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001
Title
Property Tax – Withholding of Property From Tax Sale – Demolition
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1083 (SB0376) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 (SB0557/CH0717) Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0376 (HB1083) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 /CH0717 (HB1427) Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1001 Property Tax – Withholding of Property From Tax Sale – Demolition Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:26 PM
Click to return on the top page