Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Condominiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 /CH0455 (SB0144/CH0456)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 /CH0459
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Rights and Restrictions - Composting
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361
Title
Real Property - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516
Title
Bicounty Agencies – Prince George’s County – Use and Occupancy Permits – Notice Requirements MC/PG 107-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0433
Title
Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 /CH0500 (SB0535/CH0501)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623
Title
Prince George's County - Assisted Living Program Licensing - Notice of Applicant Located in Common Ownership Community PG 401-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 /CH0524 (SB0686/CH0523)
Title
Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061 /CH0759 (SB0832/CH0760)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0457)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305
Title
Condominiums - Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 /CH0456 (HB0110/CH0455)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB1196)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535 /CH0501 (HB0593/CH0500)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 /CH0523 (HB1023/CH0524)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations - Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 /CH0760 (HB1061/CH0759)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0110 /CH0455 (SB0144/CH0456) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0248 /CH0459 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Rights and Restrictions - Composting Delegate Shetty 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0313 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0361 Real Property - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0516 Bicounty Agencies – Prince George’s County – Use and Occupancy Permits – Notice Requirements MC/PG 107-21 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0567 /CH0433 Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 /CH0500 (SB0535/CH0501) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 500
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0623 Prince George's County - Assisted Living Program Licensing - Notice of Applicant Located in Common Ownership Community PG 401-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0826 Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
HB1023 /CH0524 (SB0686/CH0523) Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 524
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1061 /CH0759 (SB0832/CH0760) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1196 (SB0457) Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1305 Condominiums - Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0144 /CH0456 (HB0110/CH0455) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 456
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0457 (HB1196) Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0535 /CH0501 (HB0593/CH0500) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0686 /CH0523 (HB1023/CH0524) Real Property - Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations - Virtual Meetings Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 523
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0832 /CH0760 (HB1061/CH0759) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page