Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Condominiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040 /CH0479
Title
Condominiums - Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093
Title
Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 (SB0065)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358
Title
Maryland Condominium Act - Amendments to the Declaration - Interest in Common Elements
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553
Title
Condominiums – Mandatory Insurance Coverage – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 /CH0282
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146
Title
Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194
Title
Condominiums - Assessment Late Fees and Liens - Notice and Timing
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 (SB0871)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 (HB0117)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139
Title
Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1259)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0040 /CH0479 Condominiums - Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments Delegate Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0117 (SB0065) Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0140 Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0358 Maryland Condominium Act - Amendments to the Declaration - Interest in Common Elements Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0401 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 Condominiums – Mandatory Insurance Coverage – Alterations Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0615 /CH0282 Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0894 Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1060 Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1061 Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1146 Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1147 Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1194 Condominiums - Assessment Late Fees and Liens - Notice and Timing Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 (SB0871) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
SB0065 (HB0117) Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0871 (HB1259) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page