Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895
Title
Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0699
Title
Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0895 Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0307 /CH0699 Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Finance
1/21/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:16 AM
Click to return on the top page