Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 /CH0727 (SB0804/CH0728)
Title
Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 (SB0527/CH0437)
Title
Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414 (SB0153)
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB1414)
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 /CH0437 (HB1051)
Title
Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 /CH0728 (HB0972/CH0727)
Title
Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0619 Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 /CH0727 (SB0804/CH0728) Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1051 (SB0527/CH0437) Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force Delegate Kelly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1414 (SB0153) Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0153 (HB1414) Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0527 /CH0437 (HB1051) Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0804 /CH0728 (HB0972/CH0727) Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:31 PM
Click to return on the top page