Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Conventions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0006)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 /CH0522
Title
Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0007)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HJ0004 United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 (SJ0006) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 /CH0522 Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0007) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page