Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Correction, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289
Title
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Incarcerated Individual Apprenticeship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775
Title
Correctional Services - Death of Incarcerated Individual - Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1154
Title
Correctional Services - Home Detention - Removal
Sponsor
Delegate Long, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 (SB0694)
Title
Correctional Services - Assessment of State Correctional System
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358
Title
Criminal Procedure - Home Detention - Time Served Credits
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 (HB1157)
Title
Correctional Services - Assessment of State Correctional System
Sponsor
Senator Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0289 Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Incarcerated Individual Apprenticeship Program Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 Correctional Services - Death of Incarcerated Individual - Notification Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/18/2025 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1154 Correctional Services - Home Detention - Removal Delegate Long, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 (SB0694) Correctional Services - Assessment of State Correctional System Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1358 Criminal Procedure - Home Detention - Time Served Credits Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0694 (HB1157) Correctional Services - Assessment of State Correctional System Senator Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 11:07 AM
Click to return on the top page