Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Correctional Institutions -see also- Patuxent Institution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0543 (SB0977)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 /CH0733
Title
Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime Involving a Handgun
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 (SB0550)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0042
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0512)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Release
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756
Title
Correctional Services - Transfers to Federal Authorities - Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders From Violent Crime Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997 (SB0850)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 /CH0350 (SB0781)
Title
Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services - Required Performance Data and Scorecard
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1058
Title
Justice and Public Health Prioritization Council
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Corrections - Housing - Serious Mental Illness
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352
Title
Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0604)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0453)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 (HB1018/CH0350)
Title
Public Safety and Behavioral Health Improvement Act
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB0997)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 (HB0067/CH0543)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0543 (SB0977) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Judiciary
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0139 /CH0733 Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0207 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime Involving a Handgun Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0453 (SB0550) Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act) Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0459 /CH0042 Juvenile Justice Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0604 (SB0512) Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0736 Correctional Services - Inmate Release Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0756 Correctional Services - Transfers to Federal Authorities - Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders From Violent Crime Act of 2022) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0877 Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0997 (SB0850) Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1018 /CH0350 (SB0781) Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services - Required Performance Data and Scorecard Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1058 Justice and Public Health Prioritization Council Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1120 Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1299 Corrections - Housing - Serious Mental Illness Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0277 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0512 (HB0604) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0453) Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0781 (HB1018/CH0350) Public Safety and Behavioral Health Improvement Act Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0850 (HB0997) Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0977 (HB0067/CH0543) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page