Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Correctional Officers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 (SB0396/CH0573)
Title
Public Safety Officer - Performance of Duties - Death Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0609 (SB0026/CH0608)
Title
Davis Martinez Public Employee Safety and Health Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647 (SB0702)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 (SB0030)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Public Safety Employee Retirement Income
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886 /CH0770 (SB0612/CH0771)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Deferred Vested Former Members – Return to Service
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 /CH0777 (SB0768/CH0776)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Clarifications
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 (SB0694)
Title
Correctional Services - Assessment of State Correctional System
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 /CH0129 (SB0502/CH0130)
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Expansion to Judicial Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Valentine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222 /CH0718
Title
Public Safety - Immigration Enforcement (Maryland Values Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 /CH0608 (HB0176/CH0609)
Title
Davis Martinez Public Employee Safety and Health Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030 (HB0792)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Public Safety Employee Retirement Income
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 /CH0573 (HB0076)
Title
Public Safety Officer - Performance of Duties - Death Benefits
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 /CH0130 (HB1200/CH0129)
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Expansion to Judicial Officer
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0771 (HB0886/CH0770)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Deferred Vested Former Members - Return to Service
Sponsor
Senator Jackson, M.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
Higher Education - Scholarships for Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 (HB1157)
Title
Correctional Services - Assessment of State Correctional System
Sponsor
Senator Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0647)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing
Sponsor
Senator Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 /CH0132
Title
Calvert County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 /CH0776 (HB1029/CH0777)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Jackson, M.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1046
Title
Correctional Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 (SB0396/CH0573) Public Safety Officer - Performance of Duties - Death Benefits Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judicial Proceedings
HB0176 /CH0609 (SB0026/CH0608) Davis Martinez Public Employee Safety and Health Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Appropriations
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0647 (SB0702) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0792 (SB0030) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Public Safety Employee Retirement Income Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0886 /CH0770 (SB0612/CH0771) State Retirement and Pension System – Deferred Vested Former Members – Return to Service Delegate Forbes 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 770
Appropriations
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1029 /CH0777 (SB0768/CH0776) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Clarifications Delegate Forbes 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Appropriations
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1102 State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - Eligibility Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 (SB0694) Correctional Services - Assessment of State Correctional System Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1200 /CH0129 (SB0502/CH0130) Property Tax - Credit for Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Expansion to Judicial Officer Delegate Valentine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Ways and Means
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1222 /CH0718 Public Safety - Immigration Enforcement (Maryland Values Act) Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Judiciary
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 /CH0608 (HB0176/CH0609) Davis Martinez Public Employee Safety and Health Act Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Finance
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2025 - 2:30 PM
SB0030 (HB0792) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Public Safety Employee Retirement Income Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2025 - 10:30 AM
SB0396 /CH0573 (HB0076) Public Safety Officer - Performance of Duties - Death Benefits Senator McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0502 /CH0130 (HB1200/CH0129) Property Tax - Credit for Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Expansion to Judicial Officer Senator Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 /CH0771 (HB0886/CH0770) State Retirement and Pension System - Deferred Vested Former Members - Return to Service Senator Jackson, M. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2025 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 Higher Education - Scholarships for Correctional Officers Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0694 (HB1157) Correctional Services - Assessment of State Correctional System Senator Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB0647) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing Senator Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 /CH0132 Calvert County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Collective Bargaining Senator Jackson, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Finance
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2025 - 2:30 PM
SB0768 /CH0776 (HB1029/CH0777) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Clarifications Senator Jackson, M. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2025 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB1046 Correctional Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/20/2025 3:57 PM
Click to return on the top page