Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

County Administrators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470
Title
Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0194
Title
Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0470 Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 /CH0194 Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page