Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

County Administrators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0848)
Title
Garrett County and Allegany County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583
Title
Maryland Center for School Safety – Public Schools – Reporting of Classroom Disruptions
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717
Title
Public Schools – Virtual Education Days – Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1129)
Title
Garrett County and Allegany County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940
Title
County Superintendents of Schools - Powers - Approval of Legal Settlements
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0336 Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 (SB0848) Garrett County and Allegany County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program Garrett County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
HB1306 Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 Maryland Center for School Safety – Public Schools – Reporting of Classroom Disruptions Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 Public Schools – Virtual Education Days – Authorization Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0848 (HB1129) Garrett County and Allegany County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Pilot Program Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
SB0940 County Superintendents of Schools - Powers - Approval of Legal Settlements Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/23/2022 1:03 PM
Click to return on the top page