Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

County and Baltimore City Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545 (SB0555/CH0063)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0168/CH0043)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 (SB0927)
Title
Public School Construction - Creative Financing Study
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0043 (HB1184)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 /CH0063 (HB0545)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 (HB1323)
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0545 (SB0555/CH0063) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB1184 (SB0168/CH0043) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB1323 (SB0927) Public School Construction - Creative Financing Study Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0168 /CH0043 (HB1184) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 /CH0063 (HB0545) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 (HB1323) Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page