Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

County Commissioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042
Title
Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 /CH0213 (SB0270/CH0214)
Title
Somerset County – Elections – County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614)
Title
Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728 (SB0371/CH0276)
Title
Carroll County – Prospective Employees and Volunteers – Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873
Title
Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Local Preference
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 /CH0104
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Award of Multiyear Contracts
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0605 (SB0545/CH0606)
Title
Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471 /CH0197 (SB0978/CH0198)
Title
Garrett County Memorial Hospital – Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0214 (HB0289/CH0213)
Title
Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728)
Title
Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613)
Title
Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 /CH0606 (HB1182/CH0605)
Title
Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 /CH0102
Title
Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 /CH0198 (HB1471/CH0197)
Title
Garrett County Memorial Hospital - Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0289 /CH0213 (SB0270/CH0214) Somerset County – Elections – County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/16/2022 - 10:00 AM
Reapportionment and Redistricting
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614) Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0728 (SB0371/CH0276) Carroll County – Prospective Employees and Volunteers – Criminal History Records Check Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Rules
HB0873 Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 Calvert County - Procurement - Local Preference Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0914 /CH0104 Calvert County - Procurement - Award of Multiyear Contracts Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1182 /CH0605 (SB0545/CH0606) Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1471 /CH0197 (SB0978/CH0198) Garrett County Memorial Hospital – Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0270 /CH0214 (HB0289/CH0213) Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Reapportionment and Redistricting
2/17/2022 - 11:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728) Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613) Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0545 /CH0606 (HB1182/CH0605) Carroll County - Commissioners - Compensation and Benefits Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0641 /CH0102 Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Reapportionment and Redistricting
2/17/2022 - 11:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0978 /CH0198 (HB1471/CH0197) Garrett County Memorial Hospital - Lease Authorization and Alterations to Board of Governors Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page