Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

County Commissioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Bouchat
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480
Title
St. Mary’s County – County Plans – Public Sewerage Systems and Water Supply Systems
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720
Title
Natural Resources - Repeal of Somers Cove Marina Commission and Improvement Fund and Alteration of Operations
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0546)
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775
Title
Correctional Services - Death of Incarcerated Individual - Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791 /CH0069 (SB0719/CH0070)
Title
Somerset County - Property Tax - Emergency Services Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 (SB0717)
Title
Somerset County - Salaries of Local Officials - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075
Title
Calvert County Board of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 (SB0885)
Title
Carroll County Board of Education - Vacancy Procedures - Alterations
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334 (SB0639)
Title
Garrett County - Bids and Contracts - Advertisement Exceptions
Sponsor
Delegate Hinebaugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401
Title
Calvert County Commissioners - Prohibited Gatherings and Events
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459 (SB0861)
Title
Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540
Title
Calvert County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Emergency Services
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 (HB0768)
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0639 (HB1334)
Title
Garrett County - Bids and Contracts - Advertisement Exceptions
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717 (HB0844)
Title
Somerset County - Salaries of Local Officials - Increase
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 /CH0070 (HB0791/CH0069)
Title
Somerset County - Property Tax - Emergency Services Tax
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767
Title
Calvert County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB1459)
Title
Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885 (HB1118)
Title
Carroll County Board of Education - Vacancy Procedures - Alterations
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule Delegate Bouchat 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
HB0480 St. Mary’s County – County Plans – Public Sewerage Systems and Water Supply Systems St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/01/2025 - 3:30 PM
HB0720 Natural Resources - Repeal of Somers Cove Marina Commission and Improvement Fund and Alteration of Operations Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 (SB0546) Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 Correctional Services - Death of Incarcerated Individual - Notification Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/18/2025 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0791 /CH0069 (SB0719/CH0070) Somerset County - Property Tax - Emergency Services Tax Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0844 (SB0717) Somerset County - Salaries of Local Officials - Increase Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Judicial Proceedings
HB1075 Calvert County Board of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1118 (SB0885) Carroll County Board of Education - Vacancy Procedures - Alterations Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1334 (SB0639) Garrett County - Bids and Contracts - Advertisement Exceptions Delegate Hinebaugh 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1401 Calvert County Commissioners - Prohibited Gatherings and Events Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1459 (SB0861) Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Alterations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1540 Calvert County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Emergency Services Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0546 (HB0768) Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Senator James 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0639 (HB1334) Garrett County - Bids and Contracts - Advertisement Exceptions Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 (HB0844) Somerset County - Salaries of Local Officials - Increase Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0719 /CH0070 (HB0791/CH0069) Somerset County - Property Tax - Emergency Services Tax Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 Calvert County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Collective Bargaining Senator Jackson, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2025 - 2:30 PM
SB0861 (HB1459) Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Alterations Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0885 (HB1118) Carroll County Board of Education - Vacancy Procedures - Alterations Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 2:15 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/19/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2025 5:52 PM
Click to return on the top page