Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Alterations, Vacancy Procedures, and Funding for Independent Positions
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354
Title
Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394 /CH0610
Title
Prince George's County - Municipal Tax Setoff, School Facilities Surcharge, and Public Safety and Behavioral Health Surcharge - Reports PG 402-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599
Title
Harford County – Board of Education – Limitations on Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 /CH0569
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 /CH0603 (SB0918)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175
Title
Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225
Title
Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Membership and Election of Officers
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB0718/CH0603)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0952 /CH0368
Title
Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0334 Harford County Board of Education - Alterations, Vacancy Procedures, and Funding for Independent Positions Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0354 Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0394 /CH0610 Prince George's County - Municipal Tax Setoff, School Facilities Surcharge, and Public Safety and Behavioral Health Surcharge - Reports PG 402-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0599 Harford County – Board of Education – Limitations on Virtual Meetings Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB0603 /CH0569 Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Ways and Means
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0718 /CH0603 (SB0918) Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments Delegate Rogers 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 603
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1175 Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1225 Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 Baltimore County - Board of Education - Membership and Election of Officers Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations Harford County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0918 (HB0718/CH0603) Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0952 /CH0368 Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:17 PM
Click to return on the top page