Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Bouchat
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0677
Title
Prince George's County - Economic Development - Workgroup on Independent Innovation in Prince George's County - Establishment PG 402-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 /CH0807 (SB0020/CH0806)
Title
Environment - Dredged Material - Containment, Redeposit, and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0294 (SB0354/CH0295)
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Harris
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointed Members - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0132 (SB0591)
Title
Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 (SB1131)
Title
Howard County Board of Education - Board Member Terms and Compensation Commission Ho. Co. 2-24
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357 /CH0967 (SB1147)
Title
Howard County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Moderate Income Housing Ho. Co. 8-24
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - People's Counsel for Land Use Planning PG/MC 112-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 /CH0354
Title
Public Schools - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Harris
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402 /CH0968
Title
Montgomery County – State’s Attorney’s Office Personnel – Application of County Personnel Laws and Collective Bargaining MC 12–24
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442 (SB1155)
Title
Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Howard County Public Schools - Established Ho. Co. 14-24
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1450 /CH0992 (SB1186)
Title
Howard County Task Force to Study Revenue Options for School Capital Needs Ho. Co. 18-24
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 /CH0295 (HB0372/CH0294)
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 (HB0609/CH0132)
Title
Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1074 /CH0532 (HB0991/CH0531)
Title
Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1131 (HB1350)
Title
Howard County Board of Education - Board Member Terms and Compensation Commission Ho. Co. 2-24
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1147 (HB1357/CH0967)
Title
Howard County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Moderate Income Housing Ho. Co. 8-24
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1186 (HB1450/CH0992)
Title
Howard County Task Force to Study Revenue Options for School Capital Needs Ho. Co. 18-24
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0081 Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule Delegate Bouchat 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0306 /CH0677 Prince George's County - Economic Development - Workgroup on Independent Innovation in Prince George's County - Establishment PG 402-24 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0343 /CH0807 (SB0020/CH0806) Environment - Dredged Material - Containment, Redeposit, and Oversight Delegate Munoz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 807
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0372 /CH0294 (SB0354/CH0295) Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program Delegate Harris 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0560 Harford County Board of Education - Appointed Members - Alterations Delegate Johnson, A. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0609 /CH0132 (SB0591) Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Appropriations
2/13/2024 - 12:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1350 (SB1131) Howard County Board of Education - Board Member Terms and Compensation Commission Ho. Co. 2-24 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2024 - 11:00 AM
HB1357 /CH0967 (SB1147) Howard County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Moderate Income Housing Ho. Co. 8-24 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 967
Ways and Means
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1364 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - People's Counsel for Land Use Planning PG/MC 112-24 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 /CH0354 Public Schools - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration Delegate Harris 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Appropriations
2/27/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1402 /CH0968 Montgomery County – State’s Attorney’s Office Personnel – Application of County Personnel Laws and Collective Bargaining MC 12–24 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 968
Appropriations
3/12/2024 - 12:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1442 (SB1155) Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Howard County Public Schools - Established Ho. Co. 14-24 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1450 /CH0992 (SB1186) Howard County Task Force to Study Revenue Options for School Capital Needs Ho. Co. 18-24 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 992
Appropriations
3/12/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0354 /CH0295 (HB0372/CH0294) Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0591 (HB0609/CH0132) Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1074 /CH0532 (HB0991/CH0531) Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1131 (HB1350) Howard County Board of Education - Board Member Terms and Compensation Commission Ho. Co. 2-24 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1147 (HB1357/CH0967) Howard County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Moderate Income Housing Ho. Co. 8-24 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1186 (HB1450/CH0992) Howard County Task Force to Study Revenue Options for School Capital Needs Ho. Co. 18-24 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page