Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029)
Title
Family Law - Marriage of Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0053/CH0050)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 (SB0668)
Title
Juveniles – Truancy Reduction Pilot Program – Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396 (SB0873)
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Industry Members - Public Nuisance
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413
Title
Child Support Enforcement - License Applications - Taxpayer Identification Number
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430
Title
Courts - Special Court Dockets - Weapons Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Court of Appeals – Chief Judge – Senate Confirmation
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 /CH0050 (HB0269)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069
Title
Courts - Standing Committee on Rules of Practice and Procedure
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668 (HB0823)
Title
Juveniles - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Smith
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB1396)
Title
Public Safety – Firearm Industry Members – Public Nuisance
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029) Family Law - Marriage of Minors Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0269 (SB0053/CH0050) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
Rules
HB0823 (SB0668) Juveniles – Truancy Reduction Pilot Program – Expansion Delegate Clippinger 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1396 (SB0873) Public Safety - Firearm Industry Members - Public Nuisance Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1413 Child Support Enforcement - License Applications - Taxpayer Identification Number Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1430 Courts - Special Court Dockets - Weapons Crimes Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 Court of Appeals – Chief Judge – Senate Confirmation Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Executive Nominations
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0053 /CH0050 (HB0269) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Senator Carter 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 50
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0069 Courts - Standing Committee on Rules of Practice and Procedure Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0668 (HB0823) Juveniles - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Expansion Senator Smith 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0873 (HB1396) Public Safety – Firearm Industry Members – Public Nuisance Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:12 AM
Click to return on the top page