Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Court Costs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 (SB0315)
Title
Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 (SB0071)
Title
Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0114)
Title
False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Authorization to Recover and Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463
Title
Civil Rights - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575
Title
Public Safety – Emergency Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859
Title
Maryland Arms Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012
Title
Police Immunity and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203
Title
Labor and Employment - Private-Sector Employers - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Business Regulation - Social Media Websites - Censored Speech
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396 (SB0873)
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Industry Members - Public Nuisance
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 (HB0290)
Title
Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 (HB0391)
Title
False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Authorization to Recover and Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 (HB0070)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB1396)
Title
Public Safety – Firearm Industry Members – Public Nuisance
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 (SB0315) Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0290 (SB0071) Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0391 (SB0114) False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Authorization to Recover and Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0463 Civil Rights - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 Public Safety – Emergency Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0859 Maryland Arms Protection Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1012 Police Immunity and Accountability Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1203 Labor and Employment - Private-Sector Employers - Right to Work Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 Business Regulation - Social Media Websites - Censored Speech Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1396 (SB0873) Public Safety - Firearm Industry Members - Public Nuisance Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 (HB0290) Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Carter) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0114 (HB0391) False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Authorization to Recover and Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0315 (HB0070) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0356 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0873 (HB1396) Public Safety – Firearm Industry Members – Public Nuisance Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page