Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Court Costs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 (SB0031)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 (SB0568)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0555
Title
Criminal Law - Unauthorized Dissemination of Personal Identifying Information - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 /CH0714 (SB0488)
Title
Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117 /CH0125 (SB0946)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Prince George's County District Council - Community Benefits Agreements - Authorization (Community Empowerment Act) PG/MC 107-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation – Visitation Reevaluations and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 (HB0158)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314
Title
Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 (HB0947/CH0714)
Title
Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0330)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0653 /CH0536 (HB1101/CH0535)
Title
Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 (HB1117/CH0125)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0158 (SB0031) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0330 (SB0568) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0555 Criminal Law - Unauthorized Dissemination of Personal Identifying Information - Prohibition Delegate Johnson, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 /CH0714 (SB0488) Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024) Delegate Phillips 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111) Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 934
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1117 /CH0125 (SB0946) Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024) Delegate Stewart 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1152 Prince George's County District Council - Community Benefits Agreements - Authorization (Community Empowerment Act) PG/MC 107-24 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1307 Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation – Visitation Reevaluations and Remedies Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 (HB0158) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0314 Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0488 (HB0947/CH0714) Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0568 (HB0330) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0653 /CH0536 (HB1101/CH0535) Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024) Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0946 (HB1117/CH0125) Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024) Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934) Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page