Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Credit Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 /CH0704 (SB0788)
Title
Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1004 /CH0427
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Credit Union Power
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213 /CH0426
Title
Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB0829/CH0704)
Title
Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 /CH0193
Title
Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0779 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0829 /CH0704 (SB0788) Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1004 /CH0427 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Credit Union Power Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 427
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 /CH0426 Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods Delegate Queen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0788 (HB0829/CH0704) Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program) Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0933 /CH0193 Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Finance
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page