Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Cremation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Crematories - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0419
Title
Health - Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Care and Custody of Human Remains
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0433 /CH0349
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0190 Office of Cemetery Oversight - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Crematories - Fees Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 /CH0419 Health - Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Care and Custody of Human Remains Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0433 /CH0349 Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page