Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Cryptocurrency

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454
Title
Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Task Force - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0665)
Title
Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1389
Title
Strategic Bitcoin Reserve Act of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305
Title
Financial Institutions and Activities - Virtual Currency Kiosks - Registration and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665 (HB0761)
Title
Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0454 Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Task Force - Establishment Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 (SB0665) Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1389 Strategic Bitcoin Reserve Act of Maryland Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0305 Financial Institutions and Activities - Virtual Currency Kiosks - Registration and Regulation Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0665 (HB0761) Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Revisions President 6 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/3/2025 10:52 AM
Click to return on the top page