Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 /CH0479 (SB0264/CH0478)
Title
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0292
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court - Sessions
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 (SB0752)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204
Title
Anne Arundel County - Assistant to the Sheriff - Appointment
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 /CH0478 (HB0542/CH0479)
Title
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0993)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0542 /CH0479 (SB0264/CH0478) Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0981 /CH0292 Cecil County - Orphans' Court - Sessions Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 (SB0752) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1204 Anne Arundel County - Assistant to the Sheriff - Appointment Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0264 /CH0478 (HB0542/CH0479) Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Senator Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB0993) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page