Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Human Relations (D5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0325
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Reasonable Accommodations for Applicants With Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181
Title
Declaration of Rights - Religious Freedom, Religious Tests, and Oaths and Affirmations
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 (SB0072)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0486)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628
Title
Employment – Workers’ Compensation and Workplace Discrimination – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Education – Interscholastic and Intramural Teams and Sports – Designation Based on Biological Sex (Save Women’s Sports Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850 (SB0666)
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928 (SB0875)
Title
Discrimination in Housing - Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Human Services - Commission on Fatherhood (Fatherhood Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238
Title
Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393 (SB0450)
Title
Harassment and Sexual Harassment - Definitions - Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 (HB0324)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry – Study
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449
Title
Unlawful Employment Practices - Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 (HB1393)
Title
Harassment and Sexual Harassment - Definitions - Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451
Title
Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations - Tolling
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0572)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0850)
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 (HB0928)
Title
Discrimination in Housing – Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910
Title
Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0010
Title
United States Congress - Support for the Francis G. Newlands Memorial Removal Act
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 /CH0325 Discrimination in Employment - Reasonable Accommodations for Applicants With Disabilities Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Economic Matters
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0181 Declaration of Rights - Religious Freedom, Religious Tests, and Oaths and Affirmations Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0324 (SB0072) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry – Study Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0572 (SB0486) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0594 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0628 Employment – Workers’ Compensation and Workplace Discrimination – Use of Medical Cannabis Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB0757 Education – Interscholastic and Intramural Teams and Sports – Designation Based on Biological Sex (Save Women’s Sports Act) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0850 (SB0666) Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0928 (SB0875) Discrimination in Housing - Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Human Services - Commission on Fatherhood (Fatherhood Protection Act) Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1238 Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1393 (SB0450) Harassment and Sexual Harassment - Definitions - Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0072 (HB0324) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry – Study Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0449 Unlawful Employment Practices - Remedies Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 (HB1393) Harassment and Sexual Harassment - Definitions - Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations - Tolling Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0572) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0666 (HB0850) Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0875 (HB0928) Discrimination in Housing – Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0910 Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0010 United States Congress - Support for the Francis G. Newlands Memorial Removal Act Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page