Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Deaf Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 (SB0528)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630 (SB0576/CH0180)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0606
Title
Education - Deaf Culture Digital Library
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1536
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Deafnet Parking Lot Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0030
Title
Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and Modernization
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0519)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 /CH0180 (HB0630)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit Certification
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0519 (SB0528) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
HB0630 (SB0576/CH0180) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit Certification Delegate Griffith 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 AM
HB0653 /CH0606 Education - Deaf Culture Digital Library Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1536 Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Deafnet Parking Lot Expansion Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
SB0020 Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name Change Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0103 /CH0030 Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and Modernization Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0519) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0576 /CH0180 (HB0630) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit Certification Senator Jones-Rodwell 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2014 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page